U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lodgepole
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 08, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • July 01, 2021: [Revoke]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 07, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.