U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Glover
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Exhibits Returned/Disposed - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Suppress ]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.