U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FourBear II
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 03, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 24, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 13, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 07, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.