U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-ap-02004-
  • Case Name: APEX ENERGY, LLC v. INTERFACE TREATING SOLUTIONS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Under Rule 9019]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • August 05, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 14, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • July 14, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Notice - ADV]
  • July 13, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 22, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • June 21, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
  • June 06, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 04, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • June 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.