U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company v. Patterson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 04, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Objection - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Affidavit in Support]
  • December 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Affidavit in Support]
  • March 21, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 16, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 04, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 26, 2022: [Counterclaim]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Dismissing Parties - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Service - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 10, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 10, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.