U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nash
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.