U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Exhibits Returned/Disposed - MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order of Dismissal - MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 15, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 11, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Compel ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • January 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 02, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • November 19, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • November 10, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Telephone Conference ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Bond Hearing - SDM]
  • September 24, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • September 20, 2021: [Revoke]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 17, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • August 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 07, 2021: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sever Defendant]
  • June 07, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 11, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.