U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Gates et al v. Rowe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Remark]
  • May 20, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 12, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.