U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Rebich et al v. Department of Veterans Affairs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 01, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • November 09, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 27, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 12, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.