U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Herrick et al v. Atain Specialty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • March 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Vacate]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • July 15, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 13, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
  • May 12, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.