U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00054
  • Case Name: DMN Auto Holdings, LLC et al v. Rimrock , LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Lis Pendens]
  • May 14, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 12, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.