U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Rickert v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Appellants Reply Brief]
  • July 12, 2021: [Appellees Brief]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • June 16, 2021: [Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record]
  • June 15, 2021: [Appellants Brief]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2021: [Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 01, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2021: [Bankruptcy Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.