U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Conway v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 09, 2021: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 19, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 13, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 13, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.