U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Goodian & Son et al v. Corteva et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 28, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Settlement Conference - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 12, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 09, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 09, 2021: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 02, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Remark]
  • May 24, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 13, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 13, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.