U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Kishineff et al v. McClendon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Mediation - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Mediation - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • June 20, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 07, 2022: [Counterclaim]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 09, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • June 11, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.