U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Smith v. Guisinger
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • August 17, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 14, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 14, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • May 14, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 14, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.