U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-bk-40030-
  • Case Name: DENISE E BANTA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2022
  • September 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
December, 2021
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
November, 2021
  • November 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Minutes of Hearing Held Non-evidentiary]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Objection to Motion]
  • October 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Vacating Order]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Amend - BK]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Setting Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.