U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Talen Montana, LLC v. Avista Corportion et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2021: [Objection - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • June 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 30, 2021: [Vacate]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • June 22, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 21, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 18, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 16, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 16, 2021: [Remand]
  • June 16, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • June 03, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Errata - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 01, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 01, 2021: [Counterclaim]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 21, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 21, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.