U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Herzog v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Remark]
  • May 26, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
  • May 17, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.