U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Danielson v. Austin Mutual Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 01, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Protective Order]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 18, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • May 18, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 18, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.