U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:17-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lasalle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.