U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-bk-20073-
  • Case Name: MEGHAN A ARNETTE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
September, 2021
  • September 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement - Pro se]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement (ProSe)]
  • August 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.