U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Hessert v City of Bozeman
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [USCA Order - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 03, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 14, 2021: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Compel]
  • September 03, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Stay]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • September 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • September 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • August 31, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Compel]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Clarify - MT]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • August 09, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Strike - SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Clarify - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 30, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • July 30, 2021: [Statement - MT]
  • July 30, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 01, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 01, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 19, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • May 19, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.