U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Chattin v. Ideal Business Partners, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Pro Se Response to Motion - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Pro Se Registration Form]
  • October 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • September 21, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Errata - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Compel]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 25, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 01, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 07, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.