U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:17-cv-00095
  • Case Name: LaFountaine v. Harvest Management sub TRS Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Application for Taxation of Costs - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 17, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2021: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • October 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [In Limine]
  • October 14, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Redact - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Redact - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Redact - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Redact - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Witness List - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Witness List - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • July 02, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • June 01, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.