U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-po-05013-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Keys
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Payment Rescheduled (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • April 01, 2022: [Minutes - Initial Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • May 19, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.