U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Pruett v. Alstad et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Serve - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to Serve - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 01, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.