U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2023: [Waiver - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Take Deposition ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 08, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Competency Hearing - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Forensic Evaluation Report - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Forensic Evaluation Report - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Letter - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Exparte Motion - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 22, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 30, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • May 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.