U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 03, 2022: [Vacate]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 17, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 14, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 14, 2021: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.