U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 31, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 02, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 13, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 09, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 29, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 24, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 24, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 20, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 03, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 21, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.