U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vanderslice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Suppress ]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 21, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.