U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Keefe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 21, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.