U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Escoto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • December 14, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 08, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 25, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 25, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 27, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 21, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.