U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.