U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Site 2020 Incorporated v. Superior Traffic Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2024
  • November 08, 2024: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Stipulation]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • July 22, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Errata - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Letters Rogatory]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 13, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Statement - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Discovery]
  • November 22, 2021: [Remark]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 29, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 15, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 15, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 14, 2021: [Patent/Trademark - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • August 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Patent/Trademark - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Administrative Record]
  • August 26, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 10, 2021: [Counterclaim]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 23, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 16, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Appear]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Appear]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 15, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 09, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • May 27, 2021: [Administrative Record]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 21, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.