U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Smith v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel on Appeal - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 24, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.