U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Berns et al v. EnTrans International, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 16, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 23, 2021: [Remand]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 09, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.