U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Sadler v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [USCA Order - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.