U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Delacruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 26, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Vacate]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.