U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:19-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Wildearth Guardians et al v. Steele et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 15, 2022: [Stay]
  • July 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Cross Appeal - SDM]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Cross Appeal - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 04, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 22, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 22, 2021: [Costs Taxed]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 07, 2021: [Application for Taxation of Costs - SDM]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 01, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 29, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • June 24, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.