U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Sullivan v. The Thirteenth Judicial District Court et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Objection - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Create Case Association]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.