U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kelly et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Exhibits Returned/Disposed - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • June 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Special Appearance]
  • May 27, 2021: [Special Appearance]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.