U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Farmhouse Partners Limited Partnership v. Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Objection - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Response - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Stay]
  • January 17, 2023: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Cross Appeal - SDM]
  • December 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 16, 2022: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 10, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 06, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Deposition]
  • June 02, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • May 30, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • May 30, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • May 27, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Final - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • May 24, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • May 24, 2022: [Produce]
  • May 24, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 24, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • May 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 20, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 22, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 15, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 29, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 28, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2022: [In Limine]
  • March 14, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Appear]
  • March 04, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • January 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 27, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 10, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Appear]
  • December 06, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Extending Scheduling Order Deadlines - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Compel]
  • November 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Remark]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.