U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sims
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.