U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00049-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Hurley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 24, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.