U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Back et al v. LexisNexis Risk Solutions et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 27, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.