U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lozier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.