U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stackhouse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Filing 2255 - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [2255 (Motion to Vacate) - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [U.S. Supreme Court Document]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • December 20, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel on Appeal - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [USCA Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 14, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Exhibits - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Stipulation - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Take Deposition ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Quash ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 03, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 27, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.