U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Tipton et al v. Horton
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment - Attorney Fees]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Stipulation]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • July 21, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2021: [Response to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 21, 2021: [Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • June 21, 2021: [Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 14, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 11, 2021: [Stay]
  • June 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.