U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00108-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Westover et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Remark - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
  • June 01, 2021: [Remark - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.